DC B22-0218 | 2017-2018 | 22nd Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 4 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-04 - Law Number L22-0085 Effective from April 25, 2018, Projected Law Date is April 25, 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 4 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-04 - Law Number L22-0085 Effective from April 25, 2018, Projected Law Date is April 25, 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, this bill allows the Mayor to provide tax abatements on real property of up to 100% for qualifying businesses building or expanding in high unemployment wards or areas. It provides for real and personal property tax abatements and credits as well as other incentives.
FUNDING NOTE - This legislation is Subject to Appropriations. See Fiscal Impact Statement under "Other Documents" tab.
Title
Relieve High Unemployment Tax Incentives Act Of 2017
Sponsors
Cnc. Jack Evans [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-01-09 - Council - Final Reading (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-12-05 - Council - First Reading CC (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-12-05 - Council - First Reading CC (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-04 | Council | Law Number L22-0085 Effective from April 25, 2018, Projected Law Date is April 25, 2018 |
2018-03-14 | Council | Transmitted to Congress, Projected Law Date is April 25, 2018 |
2018-02-23 | Council | Act A22-0257 Published in DC Register Vol 65 and Page 1805 |
2018-02-07 | Council | Enacted with Act Number A22-0257 |
2018-01-23 | Council | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on February 6, 2018 |
2018-01-09 | Council | Final Reading |
2017-12-05 | Council | First Reading |
2017-11-29 | Council | Committee Report Filed |
2017-11-29 | Council | Committee Mark-up of B22-0218 |
2017-05-08 | Council | Public Hearing Held |
2017-04-14 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2017-04-07 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2017-04-07 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on B22-0218 Published in the DC Register |
2017-04-04 | Council | Referred to Committee on Finance and Revenue |
2017-03-31 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |