DC B22-0209 | 2017-2018 | 22nd Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 24 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-28 - Act A22-0040, Expires on July 23, 2017 Published in DC Register Vol 64 and Page 3999
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 24 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-28 - Act A22-0040, Expires on July 23, 2017 Published in DC Register Vol 64 and Page 3999
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
With Life Stride, Inc.
Title
Modifications To Contract No. Rm-15-rfp-srr-104-lsi-by4-sc With Life Stride, Inc. Approval And Payment Authorization Emergency Act Of 2017
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-04 - Council - Final Reading CC (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-28 | Council | Act A22-0040, Expires on July 23, 2017 Published in DC Register Vol 64 and Page 3999 |
2017-04-24 | Council | Signed with Act Number A22-0040 |
2017-04-24 | Council | Enacted with Act Number A22-0040 |
2017-04-07 | Council | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on April 24, 2017 |
2017-04-04 | Council | Final Reading CC |
2017-04-04 | Council | Retained by the Council |
2017-03-28 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |