DC B22-0207 | 2017-2018 | 22nd Council

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Enrolled on January 15 2019 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-01-15 - Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on January 30, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, this bill requires the Department of Health Care Finance to establish a new capital project, the East End Medical Center (to be constructed on the Saint Elizabeths East Campus), and provides for its funding, operation, and maintenance. The bill also establishes a special fund, the East End Medical Center Fund and program, the East End Grocery and Retail Incentive Program. The fund shall be administered by the Department of Health Care Finance.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

East End Health Care Desert, Retail Desert, And Food Desert Elimination Act Of 2017 (now Known As "east End Food Justice Amendment Act Of 2018")

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-12-18 - Council - Final Reading CC (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-12-04 - Council - First Reading CC (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-01-15CouncilTransmitted to Mayor, Response Due on January 30, 2019
2018-12-18CouncilFinal Reading CC
2018-12-17CouncilCommittee Report Filed
2018-12-04CouncilCommittee Mark-up of B22-0207
2018-12-04CouncilFirst Reading CC
2018-11-20CouncilCommittee Mark-up of B22-0207
2018-11-20CouncilCommittee Report Filed
2017-10-12CouncilCommittee Report Filed
2017-10-05CouncilCommittee Mark-up of B22-0207
2017-05-19CouncilPublic Hearing Held
2017-04-28CouncilNotice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register
2017-04-07CouncilNotice of Intent to Act on B22-0207 Published in the DC Register
2017-04-04CouncilReferred to Committee on Health
2017-03-21CouncilIntroduced in Committee of the Whole

Washington D.C. State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback