DC B22-0204 | 2017-2018 | 22nd Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on December 21 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-12-21 - Law Number L22-0175 Effective from October 30, 2018, Projected Law Date is October 27, 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on December 21 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-12-21 - Law Number L22-0175 Effective from October 30, 2018, Projected Law Date is October 27, 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Law 22-175 establishes penalties for notices of infractions detected by automated traffic enforcement systems for failures to answer at 60 days and 120 days of the date the notice was issued. It repeals provisions that suspended out of state driver's permits for unanswered infractions and requires reinstatement of those licenses within 30 days of it's effective date. Among other things, it requires the Mayor to establish a program to allow residents to perform community service to repay debts related to unpaid notices of infractions. It establishes under what circumstances unpaid notices of infractions and assessed fines shall be dismissed.
FUNDING NOTE - This law is Subject to Appropriations. See Fiscal Impact Statement in "Other Documents" tab.
Title
Traffic And Parking Ticket Penalty Amendment Act Of 2017
Sponsors
Cnc. Trayon White [D] | Cnc. Robert White [D] | Cnc. Mary Cheh [D] | Cnc. Jack Evans [D] |
Cnc. Kenyan McDuffie [D] | Cnc. Anita Bonds [D] | Cnc. David Grosso [D] | Cnc. Charles Allen [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-07-10 - Council - Final Reading CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-26 - Council - First Reading CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-26 - Council - First Reading CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-12-21 | Council | Law Number L22-0175 Effective from October 30, 2018, Projected Law Date is October 27, 2018 |
2018-09-17 | Council | Transmitted to Congress, Projected Law Date is October 27, 2018 |
2018-09-14 | Council | Act A22-0449 Published in DC Register Vol 65 and Page 9546 |
2018-09-06 | Council | Enacted with Act Number A22-0449 |
2018-08-21 | Council | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on September 5, 2018 |
2018-07-10 | Council | Final Reading CC |
2018-06-26 | Council | First Reading CC |
2018-06-21 | Council | Committee Report Filed |
2018-06-13 | Council | Committee Mark-up of B22-0204 |
2017-10-27 | Council | Public Hearing Held |
2017-10-06 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2017-03-24 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on B22-0204 Published in the DC Register |
2017-03-21 | Council | Referred to Committee on Transportation and the Environment |
2017-03-21 | Council | Introduced in Committee of the Whole |