DC B22-0203 | 2017-2018 | 22nd Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-1)
Status: Passed on December 21 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-12-21 - Law Number L22-0179 Effective from October 30, 2018, Projected Law Date is October 27, 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-1)
Status: Passed on December 21 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-12-21 - Law Number L22-0179 Effective from October 30, 2018, Projected Law Date is October 27, 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Sequentially to the Committee on Education until December 1, 2017, for Title II only, and then to the Committee on Health with comments from the Committee of the Whole
Law 22-179, among other things, requires the Department of Health to establish a Healthy Steps Pediatric Primary Care Program to implement Healthy Steps and provide lactation support services. It requires DOH to produce reports providing information about the health of children under 3 years of age and progress towards implementing the Help Me Grow Program. The Office of the State Superintendent of Education must develop a competitive compensation scale for lead teachers and teaching assistants in child development centers and to expand income eligibility for District-subsidized child care services. It requires the Director of the Department of Consumer and Regulatory Affairs and the State Superintendent of Education to designate at least one employee to serve as an Early Childhood Development Facility Coordinator. It requires the University of the District of Columbia to partner with community-based child development centers to offer classes in the University of the District of Columbia's Early Childhood Infant and Toddler degree program.
FUNDING NOTE - This law was passed Subject to Appropriations. Partially funded by Bill 22-754; other provisions remain Subject to Appropriations.
Title
Infant And Toddler Developmental Health Services Act Of 2017 (now Known As "birth-to-three For All Dc Act Of 2018")
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-06-26 - Council - Amendment in the Nature of a Substitute (Gray) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-26 - Council - Final Reading (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-05 - Council - Postponed to June 26, 2018 (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-10 - Council - First Reading (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-26 - Council - Final Reading (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-05 - Council - Postponed to June 26, 2018 (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-10 - Council - First Reading (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-12-21 | Council | Law Number L22-0179 Effective from October 30, 2018, Projected Law Date is October 27, 2018 |
2018-09-17 | Council | Transmitted to Congress, Projected Law Date is October 27, 2018 |
2018-09-14 | Council | Act A22-0453 Published in DC Register Vol 65 and Page 9569 |
2018-09-05 | Council | Signed with Act Number A22-0453 |
2018-09-05 | Council | Enacted with Act Number A22-0453 |
2018-08-21 | Council | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on September 5, 2018 |
2018-06-26 | Council | Final Reading |
2018-06-26 | Council | Amendment in the Nature of a Substitute (Gray) |
2018-06-05 | Council | Postponed to June 26, 2018 |
2018-05-01 | Council | Postponed to June 5, 2018 |
2018-04-10 | Council | First Reading |
2018-03-15 | Council | Committee Report Filed |
2018-03-14 | Council | Committee Mark-up of B22-0203 |
2017-11-29 | Council | Committee Report Filed |
2017-11-29 | Council | Committee Mark-up of B22-0203 |
2017-09-27 | Council | Public Hearing Held |
2017-09-08 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2017-07-21 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2017-03-24 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on B22-0203 Published in the DC Register |
2017-03-21 | Council | Referred to Committee on Education |
2017-03-21 | Council | Introduced in Committee of the Whole |