DC B22-0181 | 2017-2018 | 22nd Council
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on March 7 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-09-22 - Roundtable Hearing Held
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 7 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-09-22 - Roundtable Hearing Held
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, this bill requires the Transportation Policy Planning Administration, in conjunction with the Office of Planning, to submit a bi-annual transportation study for each ward.
Title
The Proper Planning For Future Growth Amendment Act Of 2017
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-09-22 | Council | Roundtable Hearing Held |
2017-09-01 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2017-03-10 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on B22-0181 Published in the DC Register |
2017-03-07 | Council | Referred to Committee on Transportation and the Environment |
2017-03-07 | Council | Introduced in Legislative Meeting |
Washington D.C. State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://lims.dccouncil.gov/Legislation/B22-0181 |
Text | http://lims.dccouncil.gov/Download/37604/B22-0181-Introduction.pdf |