DC B22-0160 | 2017-2018 | 22nd Council
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 21 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-07-10 - Public Hearing Held
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 21 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-07-10 - Public Hearing Held
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, this bill establishes a Digital Literacy Council to advise the Mayor and Council on how to improve the digital literacy of the residents of the District. The Mayor and the Office of the State Superintendent are required to submit to the Council a digital literacy education development strategic plan for public schools and workforce development programs developed by the Digital Literacy Council (DLC). It establishes the number of positions and the makeup of the DLC. Among other things it establishes a non-lapsing Digital Literacy Council Fund to be administered by the Office of the Chief Technology Officer.
Title
Digital Literacy Council Establishment Act Of 2017
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-07-10 | Council | Public Hearing Held |
2017-06-16 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2017-03-10 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on B22-0160 Published in the DC Register |
2017-03-07 | Council | Referred to Committee on Government Operations |
2017-02-21 | Council | Introduced in Committee of the Whole |
Washington D.C. State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://lims.dccouncil.gov/Legislation/B22-0160 |
Text | http://lims.dccouncil.gov/Download/37580/B22-0160-Introduction.pdf |