DC B22-0113 | 2017-2018 | 22nd Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on February 21 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-03 - Act A22-0008, Expires on May 22, 2017 Published in DC Register Vol 64 and Page 2345
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on February 21 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-03 - Act A22-0008, Expires on May 22, 2017 Published in DC Register Vol 64 and Page 2345
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Extreme Weather Protection For Animals Emergency Amendment Act Of 2017
Title
Extreme Weather Protection For Animals Emergency Amendment Act Of 2017
Sponsors
Cnc. Brandon Todd [D] | Cnc. Robert White [D] | Cnc. Mary Cheh [D] | Cnc. Vincent Gray [D] |
Cnc. Brianne Nadeau [D] | Cnc. Jack Evans [D] | Cnc. Anita Bonds [D] | Cnc. Charles Allen [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-02-07 - Council - Final Reading (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-03 | Council | Act A22-0008, Expires on May 22, 2017 Published in DC Register Vol 64 and Page 2345 |
2017-02-21 | Council | Signed with Act Number A22-0008 |
2017-02-21 | Council | Enacted with Act Number A22-0008 |
2017-02-21 | Council | Retained by the Council |
2017-02-10 | Council | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on February 27, 2017 |
2017-02-07 | Council | Final Reading |
2017-02-07 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |