DC B22-0106 | 2017-2018 | 22nd Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Passed on May 4 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-04 - Law Number L22-0075 Effective from March 28, 2018, Projected Law Date is March 27, 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Passed on May 4 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-04 - Law Number L22-0075 Effective from March 28, 2018, Projected Law Date is March 27, 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
This legislation allows licensed pharmacy practitioners to prescribe and dispense self-administered hormonal contraceptives and also requires insurers to cover certain health care services without cost-sharing, including breast cancer screening and counseling, screening for HIV and counseling for sexually transmitted infections. It also requires insurers to provide information regarding coverage to enrollees and potential enrollees. It also provides to certain employers a religious exemption from the coverage of contraceptive products and services.
FUNDING NOTE - This law was passed Subject to Appropriations. See Bill 22-754 for funding certification and Bill 22-753 for "Subject to Appropriations" repealer language
Title
Defending Access To Women's Health Care Services Amendment Act Of 2017
Sponsors
Cnc. Charles Allen [D] | Cnc. Brianne Nadeau [D] | Cnc. Anita Bonds [D] | Cnc. Mary Cheh [D] |
Cnc. Elissa Silverman [I] | Cnc. David Grosso [D] | Cnc. Brandon Todd [D] | Cnc. Jack Evans [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-01-09 - Council - Final Reading (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-09 - Council - Amendment in the Nature of Substitute (Gray) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-12-05 - Council - First Reading (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-12-05 - Council - Amendment (Gray) (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-09 - Council - Amendment in the Nature of Substitute (Gray) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-12-05 - Council - First Reading (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-12-05 - Council - Amendment (Gray) (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-04 | Council | Law Number L22-0075 Effective from March 28, 2018, Projected Law Date is March 27, 2018 |
2018-02-13 | Council | Transmitted to Congress, Projected Law Date is March 27, 2018 |
2018-02-09 | Council | Act A22-0246 Published in DC Register Vol 65 and Page 1374 |
2018-01-31 | Council | Signed with Act Number A22-0246 |
2018-01-31 | Council | Enacted with Act Number A22-0246 |
2018-01-19 | Council | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on February 2, 2018 |
2018-01-09 | Council | Amendment in the Nature of Substitute (Gray) |
2018-01-09 | Council | Final Reading |
2017-12-05 | Council | First Reading |
2017-12-05 | Council | Amendment (Gray) |
2017-11-30 | Council | Committee Report Filed |
2017-11-02 | Council | Committee Mark-up of B22-0106 |
2017-03-20 | Council | Public Hearing Held |
2017-03-03 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2017-02-10 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on B22-0106 Published in the DC Register |
2017-02-07 | Council | Referred to Committee on Health |
2017-02-07 | Council | Introduced in Legislative Meeting |