DC B22-0075 | 2017-2018 | 22nd Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Passed on January 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-30 - Signed with Act Number A22-0610
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Passed on January 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-30 - Signed with Act Number A22-0610
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, this bill expands the list of entities that must provide language access services, including the Secretary to the Council of the District of Columbia, the Department of General Services, and Mayor's Office of Community Affairs; it requires the Office of Human Rights to publish an annual report of all decisions, orders, corrective actions, and fines issued; it establishes a new rule regarding when local education agencies must designate a language access coordinator; and establishes penalties for violations.
FUNDING NOTE - This law is Subject to Appropriations. See Fiscal Impact Statement in "Other Documents" tab.
Title
Language Access For Education Amendment Act Of 2017
Sponsors
Cnc. David Grosso [D] | Cnc. Brianne Nadeau [D] | Cnc. Vincent Gray [D] | Cnc. Charles Allen [D] |
Cnc. Robert White [D] | Cnc. Elissa Silverman [I] | Cnc. Kenyan McDuffie [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-12-04 - Council - Amendment (Mendelson) (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-12-04 - Council - Final Reading (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-11-13 - Council - First Reading (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-11-13 - Council - Amendment (Mendelson) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-10-16 - Council - Postponed to 11/13/18 Legislative Meeting (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-10-02 - Council - Postponed to 10/16/18 Legislative Meeting (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-12-04 - Council - Final Reading (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-11-13 - Council - First Reading (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-11-13 - Council - Amendment (Mendelson) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-10-16 - Council - Postponed to 11/13/18 Legislative Meeting (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-10-02 - Council - Postponed to 10/16/18 Legislative Meeting (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-30 | Council | Signed with Act Number A22-0610 |
2019-01-30 | Council | Enacted with Act Number A22-0610 |
2019-01-15 | Council | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on January 30, 2019 |
2018-12-04 | Council | Final Reading |
2018-12-04 | Council | Amendment (Mendelson) |
2018-11-13 | Council | First Reading |
2018-11-13 | Council | Amendment (Mendelson) |
2018-10-16 | Council | Postponed to 11/13/18 Legislative Meeting |
2018-10-02 | Council | Committee Mark-up of B22-0075 |
2018-10-02 | Council | Postponed to 10/16/18 Legislative Meeting |
2017-04-24 | Council | Public Hearing Held |
2017-03-31 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2017-01-27 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on B22-0075 Published in the DC Register |
2017-01-24 | Council | Referred to Committee on Committee of the Whole |
2017-01-24 | Council | Introduced in Committee of the Whole |