DC B22-0014 | 2017-2018 | 22nd Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on January 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-30 - Signed with Act Number A22-0609
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on January 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-30 - Signed with Act Number A22-0609
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, this bill protects victims of domestic violence, sexual abuse, or stalking as well as their family members against discrimination by employers and labor organizations from acts based wholly or partially upon a disruption or threat to the individual's job or workplace by a person threatening to commit domestic violence, sexual abuse, or stalking. It also makes it unlawful to deny an individual's request for a reasonable accommodation for the individual's safety and security. It will also make unlawful an adverse action that is based wholly or partially on the individual's leave request for attendance, participation or preparation for a court proceeding relating to domestic violence, sexual abuse, or stalking.
FUNDING NOTE - This law is Subject to Appropriations. See Fiscal Impact Statement in "Other Documents" tab.
Title
Protecting Victims Of Gender-based Violence Amendment Act Of 2017 (now Known As "employment Protections For Victims Of Domestic Violence, Sexual Offenses, And Stalking Amendment Act Of 2018")
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-12-18 - Council - Final Reading CC (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-12-04 - Council - First Reading CC (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-12-04 - Council - First Reading CC (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-30 | Council | Signed with Act Number A22-0609 |
2019-01-30 | Council | Enacted with Act Number A22-0609 |
2019-01-15 | Council | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on January 30, 2019 |
2018-12-18 | Council | Final Reading CC |
2018-12-04 | Council | First Reading CC |
2018-11-16 | Council | Committee Report Filed |
2018-11-15 | Council | Committee Mark-up of B22-0014 |
2017-01-13 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on B22-0014 Published in the DC Register |
2017-01-10 | Council | Referred to Committee on Judiciary and Public Safety |
2017-01-06 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |