DC B21-0934 | 2015-2016 | 21st Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Passed on December 6 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-01-06 - Transmitted to Congress, Projected Law Date is February 28, 2017
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Passed on December 6 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-01-06 - Transmitted to Congress, Projected Law Date is February 28, 2017
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Public Schools Nurse Assignment Temporary Amendment Act Of 2016
Title
Public Schools Nurse Assignment Temporary Amendment Act Of 2016
Sponsors
Cnc. David Grosso [D] | Cnc. Elissa Silverman [I] | Cnc. Robert White [D] | Cnc. Brianne Nadeau [D] |
Cnc. Charles Allen [D] | Cnc. Jack Evans [D] | Cnc. Mary Cheh [D] | Cnc. Brandon Todd [D] |
Roll Calls
2016-11-15 - Council - Final Reading CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-11-01 - Council - First Reading (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-11-01 - Council - First Reading (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-01-06 | Council | Transmitted to Congress, Projected Law Date is February 28, 2017 |
2016-12-09 | Council | Act A21-0563 Published in DC Register Vol 63 and Page 15054 |
2016-12-06 | Council | Signed with Act Number A21-0563 |
2016-12-06 | Council | Enacted with Act Number A21-0563 |
2016-11-21 | Council | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on December 6, 2016 |
2016-11-15 | Council | Final Reading CC |
2016-11-15 | Council | Retained by the Council |
2016-11-04 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on B21-0934 Published in the DC Register |
2016-11-01 | Council | First Reading |
2016-11-01 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |