DC B21-0351 | 2015-2016 | 21st Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 25 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-25 - Law Number L21-0083 Effective from March 9, 2016
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 25 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-25 - Law Number L21-0083 Effective from March 9, 2016
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
As approved, Law 21-83 adopts regulations for the Metropolitan Police Department's (MPD) Body-Worn Camera (BWC) Program. It includes provisions that permit the Chief of the MPD to issue policy directives to members regarding the program; permits MPD officers to record first amendment assemblies for limited purposes; prohibits MPD officers to create BWC recordings at or close to a school and while engaged in non-critical contacts; specifies rules and exceptions for the holding, release to public and governmental entities, and retention of BWC recordings; requires the MPD to conduct audits of the BWC program to determine compliance with regulations, impact, training and equipment needs, and whether individual privacy rights are being protected; and prohibits an individual who creates a BWC recording from access which would allow that individual to delete the recording. Freedom of Information Act requests for BWC recordings may be submitted only to the MPD.
Title
Body-worn Camera Program Regulations Amendment Act Of 2015
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-12-15 - Council - Amendment in Nature of Substitute (McDuffie) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-12-15 - Council - Amendment #1 (Mendelson) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-12-15 - Council - Amendment #2 (Mendelson) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-12-15 - Council - Final Reading (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-12-15 - Council - Amendment (Evans) & Oral amendment (Cheh) (Y: 8 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-12-01 - Council - First Reading (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-12-15 - Council - Amendment #1 (Mendelson) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-12-15 - Council - Amendment #2 (Mendelson) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-12-15 - Council - Final Reading (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-12-15 - Council - Amendment (Evans) & Oral amendment (Cheh) (Y: 8 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-12-01 - Council - First Reading (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-25 | Council | Law Number L21-0083 Effective from March 9, 2016 |
2016-01-22 | Council | Act A21-0265 Published in DC Register Vol 63 and Page 774 |
2016-01-20 | Council | Transmitted to Congress |
2016-01-12 | Council | Signed with Act Number A21-0265 |
2016-01-12 | Council | Enacted with Act Number A21-0265 |
2015-12-28 | Council | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on January 12, 2016 |
2015-12-15 | Council | Amendment #2 (Mendelson) |
2015-12-15 | Council | Amendment #1 (Mendelson) |
2015-12-15 | Council | Amendment (Evans) & Oral amendment (Cheh) |
2015-12-15 | Council | Final Reading |
2015-12-15 | Council | Amendment in Nature of Substitute (McDuffie) |
2015-12-01 | Council | First Reading |
2015-11-24 | Council | Committee Report Filed |
2015-11-19 | Council | Committee Mark-up of B21-0351 |
2015-10-21 | Council | Public Hearing Held |
2015-10-02 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2015-09-25 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on B21-0351 Published in the DC Register |
2015-09-22 | Council | Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2015-09-18 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |