DC B21-0335 | 2015-2016 | 21st Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 21 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-10-21 - Law Number L21-0155 Effective from October 8, 2016, Projected Law Date is October 8, 2016
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 21 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-10-21 - Law Number L21-0155 Effective from October 8, 2016, Projected Law Date is October 8, 2016
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Law 21-155 makes changes to District law regarding motor vehicles, bicycles, and pedestrians. It requires the District Department of Transportation (DDOT) to publish certain statistical and geographical data on its website, establishes a safety program called the Bicycle and Pedestrian Priority Area Program, requires updated training of operators associated with digital dispatch companies as well as vehicle for-hire operators, establishes an aggressive driving offense, orders DDOT to adopt an inclusive policy for accommodating all users of the District's roadways, and amends existing public safety laws by creating new motor vehicle, pedestrian, and bicycle regulations, including imposing a mandatory permanent license revocation for those convicted of a third Driving While Intoxicated (DWI) charge and by requiring mandatory participation in the Ignition Interlock System Program for DWI offenders.
Title
Bicycle And Pedestrian Safety Act Of 2015
Sponsors
Cnc. Mary Cheh [D] |
Roll Calls
2016-06-28 - Council - Final Reading CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-07 - Council - First Reading (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-07 - Council - Amendment (Cheh) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-07 - Council - First Reading (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-07 - Council - Amendment (Cheh) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-10-21 | Council | Law Number L21-0155 Effective from October 8, 2016, Projected Law Date is October 8, 2016 |
2016-08-24 | Council | Transmitted to Congress, Projected Law Date is October 8, 2016 |
2016-08-05 | Council | Act A21-0467 Published in DC Register Vol 63 and Page 10143 |
2016-07-25 | Council | Signed with Act Number A21-0467 |
2016-07-25 | Council | Enacted with Act Number A21-0467 |
2016-07-12 | Council | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on July 26, 2016 |
2016-06-28 | Council | Final Reading CC |
2016-06-07 | Council | First Reading |
2016-06-07 | Council | Amendment (Cheh) |
2016-06-02 | Council | Committee Report Filed |
2016-06-01 | Council | Committee Mark-up of B21-0335 |
2015-12-08 | Council | Public Hearing Held |
2015-10-30 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2015-09-25 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on B21-0335 Published in the DC Register |
2015-09-22 | Council | Referred to Committee on Transportation and the Environment |
2015-09-16 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |