DC B21-0152 | 2015-2016 | 21st Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Passed on November 29 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-01-06 - Transmitted to Congress, Projected Law Date is February 28, 2017
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Passed on November 29 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-01-06 - Transmitted to Congress, Projected Law Date is February 28, 2017
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, this bill amends District law to prohibit the sale of cigarettes to those under 21 years of age. Presently, the law prohibits the sale of cigarettes to those under 18 years of age.
Title
Prohibition Against Selling Tobacco Products To Individuals Under 21 Amendment Act Of 2015
Sponsors
Cnc. Kenyan McDuffie [D] | Cnc. Mary Cheh [D] | Cnc. Elissa Silverman [I] | Cnc. Vincent Orange [D] |
Cnc. Anita Bonds [D] | Cnc. Jack Evans [D] |
Roll Calls
2016-11-01 - Council - Amendment (McDuffie & Alexander) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-11-01 - Council - Final Reading (Y: 10 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-10-11 - Council - First Reading (Y: 10 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-10-11 - Council - Amendment # 2 (Grosso) (Y: 1 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-10-11 - Council - Amendment # 1 (Grosso) (Y: 1 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-11-01 - Council - Final Reading (Y: 10 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-10-11 - Council - First Reading (Y: 10 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-10-11 - Council - Amendment # 2 (Grosso) (Y: 1 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-10-11 - Council - Amendment # 1 (Grosso) (Y: 1 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-01-06 | Council | Transmitted to Congress, Projected Law Date is February 28, 2017 |
2016-12-09 | Council | Act A21-0545 Published in DC Register Vol 63 and Page 15003 |
2016-11-29 | Council | Signed with Act Number A21-0545 |
2016-11-29 | Council | Enacted with Act Number A21-0545 |
2016-11-15 | Council | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on November 30, 2016 |
2016-11-01 | Council | Final Reading |
2016-11-01 | Council | Amendment (McDuffie & Alexander) |
2016-10-11 | Council | Amendment # 2 (Grosso) |
2016-10-11 | Council | Amendment # 1 (Grosso) |
2016-10-11 | Council | First Reading |
2016-09-21 | Council | Committee Report Filed |
2016-09-21 | Council | Committee Mark-up of B21-0152 |
2016-07-07 | Council | Public Hearing Held |
2016-06-17 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2015-04-14 | Council | Referred to Committee on Health and Human Services |
2015-04-10 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on B21-0152 Published in the DC Register |
2015-04-01 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |