DC B20-0997 | 2013-2014 | 20th Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 8 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-12-19 - Act A20-0510 Published in DC Register Vol 61 and Page 12723, Expires on Mar 8, 2015
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 8 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-12-19 - Act A20-0510 Published in DC Register Vol 61 and Page 12723, Expires on Mar 8, 2015
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Standard Deduction Withholding Clarification Emergency Act Of 2014
Title
Standard Deduction Withholding Clarification Emergency Act Of 2014
Sponsors
Cnc. Jack Evans [D] |
Roll Calls
2014-11-18 - Council - Final Reading (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-12-19 | Council | Act A20-0510 Published in DC Register Vol 61 and Page 12723, Expires on Mar 8, 2015 |
2014-12-09 | Council | Returned from Mayor |
2014-12-08 | Council | Enacted with Act Number A20-0510, Expires on Mar 8, 2015 |
2014-12-02 | Council | Retained by the Council |
2014-11-28 | Council | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on Dec 12, 2014 |
2014-11-18 | Council | B20-0997 Introduced by Councilmember Evans at Office of the Secretary |