DC B20-0890 | 2013-2014 | 20th Council
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Enrolled on December 22 2014 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-12-22 - Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on Jan 7, 2015
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on December 22 2014 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-12-22 - Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on Jan 7, 2015
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Firefighter Retirement While Under Disciplinary Investigation Amendment Act Of 2014
Title
Firefighter Retirement While Under Disciplinary Investigation Amendment Act Of 2014
Sponsors
Cnc. Tommy Wells [D] | Cnc. Marion Barry [D] | Cnc. Yvette Alexander [D] | Cnc. Muriel Bowser [D] |
Cnc. David Catania [D] | Cnc. Jim Graham [D] | Cnc. Anita Bonds [D] | Cnc. Mary Cheh [D] |
Cnc. Jack Evans [D] |
Roll Calls
2014-12-02 - Council - Final Reading CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-11-18 - Council - Second Reconsideration (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-11-18 - Council - First Reconsideration (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-11-18 - Council - First Reading CC (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-11-18 - Council - Second Reconsideration (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-11-18 - Council - First Reconsideration (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-11-18 - Council - First Reading CC (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-12-22 | Council | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on Jan 7, 2015 |
2014-12-02 | Council | Final Reading CC |
2014-11-18 | Council | First Reading CC |
2014-11-07 | Council | Committee Mark-up of B20-0890 |
2014-10-15 | Council | Public Hearing on B20-0890 |
2014-09-26 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the District of Columbia Register |
2014-07-25 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on B20-0890 Published in the District of Columbia Register |
2014-07-14 | Council | B20-0890 Introduced by Councilmember Wells at Legislative Meeting |