DC B20-0721 | 2013-2014 | 20th Council
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on December 2 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-12-17 - Final Reading CC
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on December 2 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-12-17 - Final Reading CC
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
U Street/14th Street Nw Great Streets Neighborhood Retail Priority Amendment Act Of 2014
Title
U Street/14th Street Nw Great Streets Neighborhood Retail Priority Amendment Act Of 2014
Sponsors
Cnc. Jim Graham [D] |
Roll Calls
2014-12-17 - Council - Final Reading CC (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-12-02 - Council - First Reading CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-12-02 - Council - First Reading CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-12-17 | Council | Final Reading CC |
2014-12-02 | Council | First Reading CC |
2014-11-26 | Council | Committee Report Filed |
2014-11-25 | Council | Committee Mark-up of B20-0721 |
2014-05-07 | Council | Public Hearing on B20-0721 |
2014-04-18 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the District of Columbia Register |
2014-03-14 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on B20-0721 Published in the District of Columbia Register |
2014-03-04 | Council | B20-0721 Introduced by Councilmember Graham at Legislative Meeting |