DC B20-0714 | 2013-2014 | 20th Council
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Enrolled on December 22 2014 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-12-22 - Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on Jan 7, 2015
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on December 22 2014 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-12-22 - Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on Jan 7, 2015
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Sex Trafficking Of Minors Prevention Amendment Act Of 2014
Title
Sex Trafficking Of Minors Prevention Amendment Act Of 2014
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-12-02 - Council - Final Reading (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-12-02 - Council - Amendment (Cheh) (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-11-18 - Council - Final Reading (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-12-02 - Council - Amendment (Cheh) (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-11-18 - Council - Final Reading (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-12-22 | Council | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on Jan 7, 2015 |
2014-12-02 | Council | Amendment (Cheh) |
2014-11-18 | Council | First Reading |
2014-11-07 | Council | Committee Mark-up of B20-0714 |
2014-07-10 | Council | Public Hearing on B20-0714 |
2014-05-30 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the District of Columbia Register |
2014-03-14 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on B20-0714 Published in the District of Columbia Register |
2014-03-04 | Council | B20-0714 Introduced by Councilmembers Cheh, Wells, Grosso, and McDuffie at Legislative Meeting |