DC B20-0708 | 2013-2014 | 20th Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on December 8 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-12-19 - Act A20-0511 Published in DC Register Vol 61 and Page 12725
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on December 8 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-12-19 - Act A20-0511 Published in DC Register Vol 61 and Page 12725
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Housing Production Trust Fund Baseline Funding Act Of 2014
Title
Housing Production Trust Fund Baseline Funding Act Of 2014
Sponsors
Cnc. Muriel Bowser [D] | Cnc. Jim Graham [D] | Cnc. Mary Cheh [D] | Cnc. Vincent Orange [D] |
Cnc. Anita Bonds [D] |
Roll Calls
2014-11-18 - Council - Second Reconsideration (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-11-18 - Council - First Reconsideration (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-11-18 - Council - Final Reading CC (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-10-28 - Council - First Reading CC (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-11-18 - Council - First Reconsideration (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-11-18 - Council - Final Reading CC (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-10-28 - Council - First Reading CC (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-12-19 | Council | Act A20-0511 Published in DC Register Vol 61 and Page 12725 |
2014-12-10 | Council | Returned from Mayor |
2014-12-08 | Council | Enacted with Act Number A20-0511 |
2014-11-28 | Council | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on Dec 12, 2014 |
2014-11-18 | Council | Final Reading |
2014-11-14 | Council | Committee Report Filed |
2014-10-28 | Council | First Reading CC |
2014-10-21 | Council | Committee Mark-up of B20-0708 |
2014-07-10 | Council | Committee Report Filed |
2014-07-08 | Council | Committee Mark-up of B20-0708 |
2014-05-29 | Council | Public Hearing on B20-0708 |
2014-04-25 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the District of Columbia Register |
2014-03-14 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on B20-0708 Published in the District of Columbia Register |
2014-03-04 | Council | B20-0708 Introduced by Councilmember Bowser at Legislative Meeting |