DC B20-0677 | 2013-2014 | 20th Council
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on February 4 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-12-17 - Amendment (Cheh)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 4 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-12-17 - Amendment (Cheh)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
D.c. Urban Farming And Food Security Act Of 2014
Title
D.c. Urban Farming And Food Security Act Of 2014
Sponsors
Cnc. David Grosso [D] | Cnc. Mary Cheh [D] | Cnc. Tommy Wells [D] | Cnc. Muriel Bowser [D] |
Cnc. Kenyan McDuffie [D] | Cnc. Phil Mendelson [D] |
Roll Calls
2014-12-17 - Council - Final Reading (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-12-17 - Council - Amendment (Cheh) (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-11-18 - Council - Second Reconsideration (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-11-18 - Council - First Reconsideration (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-11-18 - Council - First Reading CC (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-12-17 - Council - Amendment (Cheh) (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-11-18 - Council - Second Reconsideration (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-11-18 - Council - First Reconsideration (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-11-18 - Council - First Reading CC (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-12-17 | Council | Amendment (Cheh) |
2014-12-15 | Council | Committee Report Filed |
2014-11-18 | Council | Committee Mark-up of B20-0677 |
2014-10-23 | Council | Committee Report Filed |
2014-10-21 | Council | Committee Mark-up of B20-0677 |
2014-06-12 | Council | Public Hearing on B20-0677 |
2014-04-25 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the District of Columbia Register |
2014-03-28 | Council | Re-Referral published |
2014-03-13 | Council | Re-Referred to Committee on Finance and Revenue and Committee of the Whole |
2014-02-18 | Council | Referred to Committee on Finance and Revenue and Committee of the Whole |
2014-02-04 | Council | B20-0677 Introduced by Councilmembers Grosso, Cheh, and Wells at Legislative Meeting |