DC B20-0294 | 2013-2014 | 20th Council
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on December 2 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-12-17 - Final Reading CC
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on December 2 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-12-17 - Final Reading CC
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
St. Elizabeths East Redevelopment Support Act Of 2013
Title
St. Elizabeths East Redevelopment Support Act Of 2013
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-12-17 - Council - Final Reading CC (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-12-02 - Council - First Reading CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-12-02 - Council - First Reading CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-12-17 | Council | Final Reading CC |
2014-12-02 | Council | First Reading CC |
2014-11-26 | Council | Committee Report Filed |
2014-11-25 | Council | Committee Mark-up of B20-0294 |
2013-07-02 | Council | Public Hearing on B20-0294 |
2013-06-14 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the District of Columbia Register |
2013-06-07 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on B20-0294 Published in the District of Columbia Register |
2013-06-04 | Council | Referred to Committee on Economic Development |
2013-05-30 | Council | B20-0294 Introduced by Chairman Mendelson at Office of the Secretary |