CT SR00024 | 2019 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-13 - On Consent Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-13 - On Consent Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Resolution Confirming The Nomination Of Timothy Larson Of East Hartford To Be Executive Director Of The Office Of Higher Education.
Title
Resolution Confirming The Nomination Of Timothy Larson Of East Hartford To Be Executive Director Of The Office Of Higher Education.
Sponsors
Sen. Robert Duff [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-03-13 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 26 (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-05 - Joint - EXN Vote Tally Sheet (Senate) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-05 - Joint - EXN Vote Tally Sheet (Senate) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-13 | Senate | On Consent Calendar |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Adopted, Senate |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 34 |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Public Hearing 03/0519 |
2019-01-25 | Senate | Nomination Referred to Committee on Executive and Legislative Nominations |