CT SR00009 | 2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on March 22 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-11 - Adopted, Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 22 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-11 - Adopted, Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Resolution Confirming The Nomination Of Jay A. Shaw Of Stamford To Be Reappointed A Member Of The Freedom Of Information Commission.
Title
Resolution Confirming The Nomination Of Jay A. Shaw Of Stamford To Be Reappointed A Member Of The Freedom Of Information Commission.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-04-11 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 52 (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-29 - Joint - EXN Vote Tally Sheet (Senate) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-29 - Joint - EXN Vote Tally Sheet (Senate) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-11 | Senate | Adopted, Senate |
2018-04-02 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 117 |
2018-04-02 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2018-03-29 | Senate | Public Hearing 03/29 |
2018-03-22 | Senate | Nomination Referred to Committee on Executive and Legislative Nominations |