CT SR00006 | 2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 20 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-20 - File Number 27
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 20 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-20 - File Number 27
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Resolution Approving The Stipulated Judgment In James Horan, Executor For The Estates Of Joseph J. Stavola And Jeanne C. Serocke, And John Stavola, Guardian Of James And William Stavola V. State Of Connecticut.
Title
Resolution Approving The Stipulated Judgment In James Horan, Executor For The Estates Of Joseph J. Stavola And Jeanne C. Serocke, And John Stavola, Guardian Of James And William Stavola V. State Of Connecticut.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-09 - Joint - JUD Vote Tally Sheet (Senate) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-20 | Senate | File Number 27 |
2018-03-20 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 58 |
2018-03-20 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2018-03-20 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/19/18 5:00 PM |
2018-03-12 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2018-03-09 | Senate | Senate Favorable |
2018-02-26 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Judiciary |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Filed with Senate Clerks |