CT SJ00054 | 2022 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 19 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-19 - In Concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 19 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-19 - In Concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Resolution Confirming The Nomination Of William F. Dow Iii Of New Haven To Be A Member Of The Judicial Review Council.
Title
Resolution Confirming The Nomination Of William F. Dow Iii Of New Haven To Be A Member Of The Judicial Review Council.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-12 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 105 (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-07 - Joint - EXN Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-04-07 - Joint - EXN Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-19 | House | In Concurrence |
2022-04-19 | House | Adopted, House |
2022-04-12 | House | House Calendar Number 327 |
2022-04-12 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2022-04-12 | House | Immediate Transmittal to the House |
2022-04-12 | Senate | On Consent Calendar |
2022-04-12 | Senate | Adopted, Senate |
2022-04-08 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 277 |
2022-04-08 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2022-04-07 | Senate | Public Hearing 04/07 |
2022-02-09 | Senate | Nomination Referred to Committee on Executive and Legislative Nominations |