CT SJ00047 | 2021 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 27 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-27 - In Concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 27 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-27 - In Concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Resolution Confirming The Nomination Of Allan B. Taylor Of West Hartford To Be Reappointed A Member Of The State Board Of Education.
Title
Resolution Confirming The Nomination Of Allan B. Taylor Of West Hartford To Be Reappointed A Member Of The State Board Of Education.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-20 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 215 (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-27 | Senate | In Concurrence |
2021-05-27 | Senate | Adopted, House |
2021-05-21 | Senate | House Calendar Number 519 |
2021-05-21 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2021-05-20 | Senate | Adopted, Senate |
2021-05-10 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 407 |
2021-05-10 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2021-05-07 | Senate | Public Hearing 05/07 |
2021-04-13 | Senate | Nomination Referred to Committee on Executive and Legislative Nominations |