CT SJ00043 | 2021 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-26 - In Concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-26 - In Concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Resolution Confirming The Nomination Of Suzette Brown Of Bloomfield To Be A Member Of The Board Of Directors Of The Materials Innovation And Recycling Authority.
Title
Resolution Confirming The Nomination Of Suzette Brown Of Bloomfield To Be A Member Of The Board Of Directors Of The Materials Innovation And Recycling Authority.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-14 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 90 (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-25 - Joint - EXN Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-25 - Joint - EXN Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-26 | Senate | In Concurrence |
2021-04-26 | Senate | Adopted, House |
2021-04-15 | Senate | House Calendar Number 352 |
2021-04-15 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2021-04-14 | Senate | On Consent Calendar |
2021-04-14 | Senate | Adopted, Senate |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 160 |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Public Hearing 03/25 |
2021-01-06 | Senate | Nomination Referred to Committee on Executive and Legislative Nominations |