CT SJ00035 | 2023 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on March 1 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-03-28 - File Number 260
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 1 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-03-28 - File Number 260
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Resolution Proposing A State Constitutional Amendment To Allow Individuals Who Have Attained The Age Of Sixteen To Apply For Admission As Electors And To Be So Admitted Upon Attaining The Age Of Eighteen.
Title
Resolution Proposing A State Constitutional Amendment To Allow Individuals Who Have Attained The Age Of Sixteen To Apply For Admission As Electors And To Be So Admitted Upon Attaining The Age Of Eighteen.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-03-15 - Joint - GAE Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 13 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-28 | Senate | File Number 260 |
2023-03-28 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 185 |
2023-03-28 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2023-03-28 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2023-03-22 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/27/23 5:00 PM |
2023-03-16 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2023-03-15 | Senate | Joint Favorable |
2023-03-02 | Senate | Public Hearing 03/06 |
2023-03-01 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Government Administration and Elections |