CT SJ00026 | 2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 3 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-02-17 - In Concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 3 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-02-17 - In Concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Resolution Confirming The Nomination Of Scott D. Bates, Esq. Of Stonington To Be Appointed To The Board Of Directors Of The Connecticut Port Authority.
Title
Resolution Confirming The Nomination Of Scott D. Bates, Esq. Of Stonington To Be Appointed To The Board Of Directors Of The Connecticut Port Authority.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-02-17 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 21 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-17 | House | In Concurrence |
2016-02-17 | House | Adopted, House |
2016-02-17 | House | Rules Suspended |
2016-02-17 | House | Rules Suspended, Transmitted to the House |
2016-02-17 | Senate | On Consent Calendar |
2016-02-17 | Senate | Adopted, Senate |
2016-02-17 | Senate | Rules Suspended |
2016-02-16 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 21 |
2016-02-16 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2016-02-11 | Senate | Public Hearing 02/11 |
2016-02-03 | Senate | Nomination Referred to Committee on Executive and Legislative Nominations |