CT SJ00024 | 2019 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 14 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-13 - In Concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 14 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-13 - In Concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Resolution Confirming The Nomination Of The Honorable Lubbie Harper, Jr. Of North Haven To Be A State Referee.
Title
Resolution Confirming The Nomination Of The Honorable Lubbie Harper, Jr. Of North Haven To Be A State Referee.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-13 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 20 ADOPT (Y: 33 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-13 - House - House Roll Call Vote 14 (Y: 138 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-25 - Joint - JUD Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 32 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-03-13 - House - House Roll Call Vote 14 (Y: 138 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-25 - Joint - JUD Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 32 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-13 | House | In Concurrence |
2019-03-13 | House | Adopted, House |
2019-03-13 | House | Rules Suspended |
2019-03-13 | House | Rules Suspended, Transmitted to the House |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Adopted, Senate |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 26 |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2019-02-25 | Senate | Public Hearing 02/25 |
2019-02-14 | Senate | Nomination Referred to Committee on Judiciary |