CT SJ00022 | 2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 3 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-02-17 - In Concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 3 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-02-17 - In Concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Resolution Confirming The Nomination Of The Honorable Christine S. Vertefeuille Of East Haven To Be A Senior Judge Of The Supreme Court And A Senior Judge Of The Superior Court.
Title
Resolution Confirming The Nomination Of The Honorable Christine S. Vertefeuille Of East Haven To Be A Senior Judge Of The Supreme Court And A Senior Judge Of The Superior Court.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-02-17 - House - House Roll Call Vote 7 (Y: 145 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2016-02-17 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 17 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-17 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 17 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-17 | House | In Concurrence |
2016-02-17 | House | Adopted, House |
2016-02-17 | House | Rules Suspended |
2016-02-17 | House | Rules Suspended, Transmitted to the House |
2016-02-17 | Senate | On Consent Calendar |
2016-02-17 | Senate | Adopted, Senate |
2016-02-11 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 17 |
2016-02-11 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2016-02-10 | Senate | Public Hearing 02/10 |
2016-02-03 | Senate | Nomination Referred to Committee on Judiciary |