CT SJ00021 | 2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on February 8 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-18 - In Concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 8 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-18 - In Concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Resolution Confirming The Nomination Of Mitchell M. Fuchs Of Fairfield To Be Reappointed A Member Of The Connecticut Commuter Rail Council.
Title
Resolution Confirming The Nomination Of Mitchell M. Fuchs Of Fairfield To Be Reappointed A Member Of The Connecticut Commuter Rail Council.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-04-11 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 41 (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-22 - Joint - EXN Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-22 - Joint - EXN Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-18 | House | In Concurrence |
2018-04-18 | House | Adopted, House |
2018-04-12 | House | House Calendar Number 296 |
2018-04-12 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2018-04-11 | House | Rules Suspended, Transmitted to the House |
2018-04-11 | Senate | On Consent Calendar |
2018-04-11 | Senate | Adopted, Senate |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 24 |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2018-02-22 | Senate | Public Hearing 02/22 |
2018-02-08 | Senate | Nomination Referred to Committee on Executive and Legislative Nominations |