CT SJ00014 | 2019 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 24-1)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-15 - File Number 663
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-15 - File Number 663
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To propose an amendment to the Constitution of the state to permit early in-person voting.
Title
Resolution Proposing A State Constitutional Amendment To Permit Early Voting.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-29 - Joint - GAE Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 10 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-06 - Joint - GAE Vote Tally Sheet (Vote to Draft) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-06 - Joint - GAE Vote Tally Sheet (Vote to Draft) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-15 | Senate | File Number 663 |
2019-04-15 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 322 |
2019-04-15 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2019-04-15 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/15/19 10:00 AM |
2019-04-01 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2019-03-29 | Senate | Joint Favorable |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Public Hearing 03/25 |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Government Administration and Elections |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Vote to Draft |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Drafted by Committee |
2019-01-23 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Government Administration and Elections |