CT SJ00005 | 2024 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 17 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-17 - In Concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 17 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-17 - In Concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Resolution Confirming The Nomination Of Alex Harris Of Ridgefield To Be A Member Of The Commission On Human Rights And Opportunities.
Title
Resolution Confirming The Nomination Of Alex Harris Of Ridgefield To Be A Member Of The Commission On Human Rights And Opportunities.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-25 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 38 (Y: 25 N: 7 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-16 - Joint - EXN Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2024-02-16 - Joint - EXN Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-17 | Senate | In Concurrence |
2024-04-17 | House | Adopted, House |
2024-03-26 | House | House Calendar Number 117 |
2024-03-26 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2024-03-25 | House | Rules Suspended, Transmitted to the House |
2024-03-25 | Senate | Adopted, Senate |
2024-02-20 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 21 |
2024-02-20 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2024-02-16 | Senate | Public Hearing 02/16 |
2024-02-05 | Senate | Nomination Referred to Committee on Executive and Legislative Nominations |