CT SB01236 | 2023 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on March 16 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-05-04 - File Number 706
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 16 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-05-04 - File Number 706
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To (1) allow the retention of certain balances outstanding in the special account for the purpose of reimbursement of the ten-cent refund value for redeemed beverage containers that commences January 1, 2024, and (2) reduce the percentages of the unclaimed beverage container deposits that are required to be paid by deposit initiators for deposit in the General Fund.
Title
An Act Concerning The Amounts Of Unclaimed Beverage Container Deposits To Be Paid For Deposit In The General Fund.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-04-19 - Joint - FIN Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable Substitute) (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-04 | Senate | File Number 706 |
2023-05-04 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 433 |
2023-05-04 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2023-05-04 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2023-04-28 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 05/03/23 5:00 PM |
2023-04-20 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2023-04-19 | Senate | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2023-03-20 | Senate | Public Hearing 03/24 |
2023-03-16 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding |