CT SB01194 | 2011 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on March 24 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-31 - Transmitted to the Secretary of State
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on March 24 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-31 - Transmitted to the Secretary of State
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An Act Concerning The Authorization Of Bonds Of The State For Capital Resurfacing And Related Reconstruction Projects.
Title
An Act Concerning The Authorization Of Bonds Of The State For Capital Resurfacing And Related Reconstruction Projects.
Sponsors
Rep. Jeffrey Berger [D] | Rep. Christopher Donovan [D] | Rep. Gregory Haddad [D] | Sen. Martin Looney [D] |
Rep. Joseph Serra [D] | Rep. Brendan Sharkey [D] | Rep. Charlie Stallworth [D] | Sen. Donald Williams [D] |
Roll Calls
2011-03-16 - House - House Roll Call Vote 23 EMERGENCY CERTIFI (Y: 117 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2011-03-16 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 40 EMERGENCY CERTIFICATION (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-16 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 40 EMERGENCY CERTIFICATION (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-31 | Transmitted to the Secretary of State | |
2011-03-24 | Special Act 11-1 | |
2011-03-21 | Signed by Governor in Original | |
2011-03-16 | Rules Suspended, Transmitted to the Governor | |
2011-03-16 | In Concurrence | |
2011-03-16 | House Passed | |
2011-03-16 | Immediate Transmittal to the House | |
2011-03-16 | Senate Passed | |
2011-03-15 | Emergency Certification |