CT SB01179 | 2023 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1-1)
Status: Engrossed on May 24 2023 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-05-26 - House Calendar Number 611
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 24 2023 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-05-26 - House Calendar Number 611
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To amend both the Connecticut Paid Family and Medical Leave Act and Connecticut Family Medical Leave Act to (1) include tribal enterprises and transit districts, and (2) prohibit disability benefits from being offset by benefits received under such programs.
Title
An Act Amending Connecticut Paid Family Medical Leave.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-05-24 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 251 (Y: 12 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2023-05-24 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 252 (Y: 12 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2023-05-24 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 253 (Y: 25 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-23 - Joint - LAB Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable Substitute) (Y: 8 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-24 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 252 (Y: 12 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2023-05-24 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 253 (Y: 25 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-23 - Joint - LAB Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable Substitute) (Y: 8 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-26 | House | House Calendar Number 611 |
2023-05-26 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2023-05-24 | Senate | Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A |
2023-05-24 | Senate | Senate Rejected Senate Amendment Schedule C 6912 |
2023-05-24 | Senate | Senate Rejected Senate Amendment Schedule B 8649 |
2023-05-24 | Senate | Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 8594 |
2023-04-11 | Senate | File Number 499 |
2023-04-11 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 283 |
2023-04-11 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2023-04-11 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2023-04-03 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/11/23 12:00 PM |
2023-03-24 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2023-03-23 | Senate | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2023-03-03 | Senate | Public Hearing 03/09 |
2023-03-02 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Labor and Public Employees |