CT SB01162 | 2023 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-2-1)
Status: Passed on June 27 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-27 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-2-1)
Status: Passed on June 27 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-27 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
To require law enforcement units to hold community roundtables and establish a pilot program to fund community policing programs in certain municipalities, to reduce gun violence and improve relationships between law enforcement units and the communities they serve.
Title
An Act Requiring Community Roundtables.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-06-05 - House - House Roll Call Vote 280 SENATE AMD A (Y: 95 N: 52 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-06-05 - House - House Roll Call Vote 281 AS AMENDED (Y: 135 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-05-24 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 248 (Y: 12 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2023-05-24 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 249 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-01 - Joint - APP Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-16 - Joint - PS Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable Substitute) (Y: 21 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-05 - House - House Roll Call Vote 281 AS AMENDED (Y: 135 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-05-24 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 248 (Y: 12 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2023-05-24 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 249 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-01 - Joint - APP Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-16 - Joint - PS Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable Substitute) (Y: 21 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-27 | Senate | Signed by the Governor |
2023-06-26 | Senate | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor |
2023-06-26 | Senate | Transmitted to the Secretary of State |
2023-06-15 | Senate | Public Act 23-146 |
2023-06-05 | Senate | In Concurrence |
2023-06-05 | House | House Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A |
2023-06-05 | House | House Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A |
2023-05-26 | House | House Calendar Number 610 |
2023-05-26 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2023-05-24 | Senate | Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A |
2023-05-24 | Senate | Senate Rejected Senate Amendment Schedule B 7061 |
2023-05-24 | Senate | Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 8368 |
2023-05-02 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2023-05-02 | Senate | No New File by Committee on Appropriations |
2023-05-02 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2023-05-02 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2023-05-01 | Senate | Joint Favorable |
2023-04-26 | Senate | Referred by Senate to Committee on Appropriations |
2023-04-03 | Senate | File Number 391 |
2023-04-03 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 227 |
2023-04-03 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2023-04-03 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2023-03-27 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/03/23 12:00 PM |
2023-03-16 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2023-03-16 | Senate | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2023-03-03 | Senate | Public Hearing 03/09 |
2023-03-01 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Public Safety and Security |