CT SB01148 | 2023 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum:
Status: Passed on June 28 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-28 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum:
Status: Passed on June 28 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-28 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
To establish permits for the taking of bear that damage crops, livestock or bees, authorize the killing of bears that cause harm to a person or pet or that enter an occupied building, provide for an annual bear hunt season in Litchfield County by lottery and prohibit the intentional and unintentional feeding of potentially dangerous animals.
Title
An Act Authorizing Certain Killing Of Black Bear And Prohibiting Intentional Feeding Of Potentially Dangerous Animals.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-06-02 - House - House Roll Call Vote 252 SENATE AMD A (Y: 101 N: 45 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2023-06-02 - House - House Roll Call Vote 253 AS AMENDED (Y: 115 N: 32 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-05-18 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 211 (Y: 31 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-03 - Joint - JUD Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 25 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2023-03-24 - Joint - ENV Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable Substitute) (Y: 23 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-24 - Joint - ENV Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 23 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-02 - House - House Roll Call Vote 253 AS AMENDED (Y: 115 N: 32 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-05-18 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 211 (Y: 31 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-03 - Joint - JUD Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 25 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2023-03-24 - Joint - ENV Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable Substitute) (Y: 23 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-24 - Joint - ENV Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 23 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-28 | Senate | Signed by the Governor |
2023-06-15 | Senate | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor |
2023-06-15 | Senate | Transmitted to the Secretary of State |
2023-06-12 | Senate | Public Act 23-77 |
2023-06-02 | Senate | In Concurrence |
2023-06-02 | House | House Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A |
2023-06-02 | House | House Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A |
2023-05-19 | House | House Calendar Number 569 |
2023-05-19 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2023-05-18 | Senate | Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A |
2023-05-18 | Senate | Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 8180 |
2023-05-03 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2023-05-03 | Senate | No New File by Committee on Judiciary |
2023-05-03 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2023-05-03 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2023-05-03 | Senate | Joint Favorable |
2023-04-26 | Senate | Referred by Senate to Committee on Judiciary |
2023-04-12 | Senate | File Number 518 |
2023-04-12 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 314 |
2023-04-12 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2023-04-12 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2023-04-04 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/11/23 5:00 PM |
2023-03-27 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2023-03-24 | Senate | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2023-03-06 | Senate | Public Hearing 03/10 |
2023-02-28 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Environment |