CT SB01131 | 2011 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on March 3 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-04-01 - Referred by Senate to Committee on Public Health
Pending: Joint Public Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 3 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-04-01 - Referred by Senate to Committee on Public Health
Pending: Joint Public Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To require persons delivering scrap metal to scrap metal processors to certify the origin of such metal, to improve enforcement of certain professional and occupational licensing, certification and registration laws, to authorize the Commissioner of Consumer Protection to issue retirement status licenses for certain occupations and trades, to prohibit certain abusive debt collection practices, to require the Commissioner of Consumer Protection to revise the residential property condition disclosure report form and to require pharmacists to provide more effective notice to patients who receive generic drug substitutes.
Title
An Act Concerning Scrap Metal Processors, Professional And Occupational Retirement Status Licenses, And Generic Drug Product Substitutions.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-01 | Referred by Senate to Committee on Public Health | |
2011-03-23 | File Number 169 | |
2011-03-23 | Senate Calendar Number 142 | |
2011-03-23 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | |
2011-03-23 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2011-03-17 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/22/11 5:00 PM | |
2011-03-11 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2011-03-10 | Joint Favorable Substitute | |
2011-03-04 | Public Hearing 03/08 | |
2011-03-03 | Referred to Joint Committee on General Law |