CT SB01123 | 2015 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on March 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-06-01 - Removed from the Foot of the Calendar, Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-06-01 - Removed from the Foot of the Calendar, Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To review the programs administered by state agencies providing social services.
Title
An Act Concerning Expenditures Of State Agencies Providing Social Services.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-01 | Senate | Removed from the Foot of the Calendar, Senate |
2015-05-27 | Senate | Moved to Foot of the Calendar, Senate |
2015-05-07 | Senate | File Number 778 |
2015-05-07 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 455 |
2015-05-07 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2015-05-07 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2015-05-01 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 05/06/15 5:00 PM |
2015-04-30 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2015-04-29 | Senate | Joint Favorable |
2015-04-17 | Senate | Public Hearing 04/21 |
2015-03-20 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Appropriations |