CT SB01116 | 2021 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on May 7 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-27 - File Number 744
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 7 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-27 - File Number 744
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To convey a parcel of state land in the town of Rocky Hill to the town of Rocky Hill for municipal purposes.
Title
An Act Concerning The Conveyance Of A Parcel Of State Land In The Town Of Rocky Hill.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-19 - Joint - GAE Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable Substitute) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-27 | Senate | File Number 744 |
2021-05-27 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 507 |
2021-05-27 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2021-05-27 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2021-05-21 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 05/26/21 5:00 PM |
2021-05-19 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2021-05-19 | Senate | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2021-05-10 | Senate | Public Hearing 05/14 |
2021-05-07 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Government Administration and Elections |