CT SB01105 | 2015 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 30 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-30 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 30 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-30 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
To clarify that the period of probation for an incarcerated individual begins after the completion of the period of incarceration in response to the ruling in State v. Moore, to facilitate the return to Connecticut of fugitive defendants in criminal cases who have absconded to another jurisdiction after having bond posted through a bail bond agent, to include home invasion as a predicate offense to the crime of felony murder, to provide an appropriate penalty for assault that results in serious physical injury, to clarify that the ten-year period of registration for certain sexual offenders commences after any term of incarceration is completed, to provide for a more appropriate means of disposition in certain cases of simple trespass and to amend the statutes concerning tampering with a witness.
Title
An Act Concerning Revisions To The Criminal Justice Statutes, And Concerning The Psychiatric Security Review Board, Domestic Violence, Condominium Associations And Depositions Of Persons Living Out-of-state.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-06-03 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 474 PASS (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-29 - House - House Roll Call Vote 279 AS AMENDED (Y: 135 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2015-05-07 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 155 (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-29 - House - House Roll Call Vote 279 AS AMENDED (Y: 135 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2015-05-07 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 155 (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-30 | House | Signed by the Governor |
2015-06-22 | House | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor |
2015-06-22 | House | Transmitted to the Secretary of State |
2015-06-17 | House | Public Act 15-211 |
2015-06-03 | House | On Consent Calendar / In Concurrence |
2015-06-03 | House | Senate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A |
2015-06-03 | House | Senate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A |
2015-05-30 | House | File Number 924 |
2015-05-30 | House | Disagreeing Action, Tabled for Calendar, Senate |
2015-05-29 | House | Immediate Transmittal to the Senate |
2015-05-29 | Senate | House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A |
2015-05-29 | Senate | House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 8655 |
2015-05-08 | Senate | House Calendar Number 537 |
2015-05-08 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2015-05-07 | Senate | On Consent Calendar |
2015-05-07 | Senate | Senate Passed |
2015-04-23 | Senate | File Number 741 |
2015-04-23 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 432 |
2015-04-23 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2015-04-23 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2015-04-17 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/22/15 5:00 PM |
2015-04-07 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2015-04-06 | Senate | Joint Favorable |
2015-03-16 | Senate | Public Hearing 03/20 |
2015-03-13 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Judiciary |