CT SB01058 | 2021 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Engrossed on May 12 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-14 - House Calendar Number 513
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 12 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-14 - House Calendar Number 513
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To modify standards used by the Board of Pardons and Paroles to determine when an inmate may be eligible for compassionate parole release and to clarify that whistle blower protections apply to staff of the Department of Correction who report suspected unlawful uses of force by other staff members.
Title
An Act Concerning Compassionate Or Medical Parole Release By The Board Of Pardons And Paroles And Concerning Staff Of The Department Of Correction.
Sponsors
House Judiciary Committee | Sen. Martin Looney [D] | Rep. Travis Simms [D] | Sen. Patricia Miller [D] |
Rep. Anthony Nolan [D] | Rep. Geraldo Reyes [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-05-12 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 135 (Y: 12 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-05-12 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 136 (Y: 24 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-05 - Joint - JUD Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable Substitute) (Y: 31 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-05-12 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 136 (Y: 24 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-05 - Joint - JUD Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable Substitute) (Y: 31 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-14 | Senate | House Calendar Number 513 |
2021-05-14 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2021-05-12 | Senate | Senate Passed |
2021-05-12 | Senate | Senate Rejected Senate Amendment Schedule A 8312 |
2021-04-26 | Senate | File Number 615 |
2021-04-26 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 350 |
2021-04-26 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2021-04-26 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/26/21 10:00 AM |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2021-04-05 | Senate | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Public Hearing 03/22 |
2021-03-17 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Judiciary |