CT SB01051 | 2017 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 12 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-12 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

To (1) specify that applications for CTNext planning grants-in-aid and innovation place designations continue to be accepted, (2) allow the invest CT Fund tax credit to be sold, assigned or otherwise transferred to one or more taxpayers, and (3) specify that state funds invested by the Treasurer with venture capital firms that meet certain state nexus requirements.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act Concerning Ctnext Planning Grants-in-aid And Innovation Place Designation Applications And Invest Ct Fund Tax Credit Transferability.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-06-07 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 457 ADOPT (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-07 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 458 ADOPT (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-06 - House - House Roll Call Vote 354 AS AMENDED (Y: 146 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-06-02 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 280 ADOPT (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-27 - Joint - FIN Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-07-12SenateSigned by the Governor
2017-06-29SenateTransmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
2017-06-29SenateTransmitted to the Secretary of State
2017-06-26SenatePublic Act 17-244
2017-06-07SenateOn Consent Calendar / In Concurrence
2017-06-07SenateSenate Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
2017-06-07SenateSenate Adopted House Amendment Schedule A
2017-06-06SenateDisagreeing Action, Tabled for Calendar, Senate
2017-06-06SenateTransmitted Pursuant To Joint Rule 17
2017-06-06SenateHouse Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
2017-06-06SenateHouse Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 8777
2017-06-03SenateHouse Calendar Number 648
2017-06-03SenateFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
2017-06-01SenateOn Consent Calendar
2017-06-01SenateSenate Passed
2017-05-15SenateFile Number 767
2017-05-15SenateSenate Calendar Number 464
2017-05-15SenateFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
2017-05-15SenateReported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
2017-05-08SenateReferred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 05/15/17 10:00 AM
2017-04-28SenateFiled with Legislative Commissioners' Office
2017-04-27SenateJoint Favorable
2017-04-21SenatePublic Hearing 04/25
2017-04-19SenateReferred to Joint Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding

Connecticut State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback