CT SB01045 | 2021 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on May 13 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-14 - House Calendar Number 512
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 13 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-14 - House Calendar Number 512
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To: (1) Allow a child, stepchild or other dependent child to retain health insurance coverage under a parent's individual or group health insurance policy until the policy anniversary date after the date on which the child, stepchild or other dependent child attains the age of twenty-six; (2) prohibit certain health carriers from requiring the use of step therapy for drugs prescribed to treat behavioral health conditions or chronic, disabling or life-threatening conditions or diseases; (3) redefine "clinical peer" for the purposes of adverse determination and utilization reviews; (4) require health carriers to bear the burden of proving that certain health care services under adverse determination or utilization review are not medically necessary; and (5) require health carriers to provide certain clinical peers with the authority to reverse initial adverse determinations.
Title
An Act Concerning Step Therapy, Adverse Determination And Utilization Reviews, And Health Insurance Coverage For Children, Stepchildren And Other Dependent Children.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-13 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 166 (Y: 34 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-03 - Joint - APP Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 31 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2021-03-22 - Joint - INS Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 15 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-03 - Joint - APP Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 31 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2021-03-22 - Joint - INS Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 15 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-14 | Senate | House Calendar Number 512 |
2021-05-14 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2021-05-13 | Senate | Senate Passed |
2021-05-05 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2021-05-05 | Senate | No New File by Committee on Appropriations |
2021-05-04 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2021-05-04 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2021-05-03 | Senate | Joint Favorable |
2021-04-28 | Senate | Referred by Senate to Committee on Appropriations |
2021-04-08 | Senate | File Number 370 |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 237 |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2021-04-01 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/07/21 5:00 PM |
2021-03-23 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2021-03-22 | Senate | Joint Favorable |
2021-03-12 | Senate | Public Hearing 03/18 |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Insurance and Real Estate |