CT SB01045 | 2011 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on May 26 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-28 - House Calendar Number 562
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 26 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-28 - House Calendar Number 562
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To allow certified homeless youths and emancipated minors under eighteen years of age to obtain certified copies of their birth certificates.
Title
An Act Providing Homeless Youths And Emancipated Minors Access To Birth Certificates.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-05-26 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 280 PASS AS AMENDED BY SEN A (Y: 31 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-28 | House Calendar Number 562 | |
2011-05-28 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | |
2011-05-26 | Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A | |
2011-05-26 | Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 6377 | |
2011-04-20 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | |
2011-04-20 | No New File by Committee on Planning and Development | |
2011-04-19 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2011-04-19 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2011-04-18 | Joint Favorable | |
2011-04-14 | Referred by Senate to Committee on Planning and Development | |
2011-03-29 | File Number 263 | |
2011-03-29 | Senate Calendar Number 185 | |
2011-03-29 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | |
2011-03-29 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2011-03-23 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/28/11 5:00 PM | |
2011-03-15 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2011-03-14 | Joint Favorable | |
2011-03-09 | Favorable Change of Reference, House to Committee on Public Health | |
2011-03-09 | Favorable Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on Public Health | |
2011-03-08 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2011-03-04 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2011-03-03 | Joint Favorable PH | |
2011-02-24 | Public Hearing 03/01 | |
2011-02-23 | Referred to Joint Committee on Children |