CT SB01041 | 2017 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on May 25 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-26 - House Calendar Number 609
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 25 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-26 - House Calendar Number 609
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To require any person awaiting sentencing for aggravated sexual assault to be monitored by a global positioning system device.
Title
An Act Concerning Gps Monitoring Of Convicted Persons Awaiting Sentencing For Aggravated Sexual Assault.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-26 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 235 ADOPT (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-04 - Joint - JUD Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-04 - Joint - JUD Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-26 | Senate | House Calendar Number 609 |
2017-05-26 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2017-05-25 | Senate | On Consent Calendar |
2017-05-25 | Senate | Senate Passed |
2017-05-25 | Senate | Amendment Withdrawn, Senate Amendment Schedule A 7930 |
2017-04-20 | Senate | File Number 678 |
2017-04-20 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 360 |
2017-04-20 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2017-04-20 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2017-04-13 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/19/17 5:00 PM |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Joint Favorable |
2017-03-20 | Senate | Public Hearing 03/24 |
2017-03-17 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Judiciary |