CT SB01039 | 2021 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1-1)
Status: Passed on July 12 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-12 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1-1)
Status: Passed on July 12 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-12 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
To require (1) the Department of Administrative Services to issue a request for information for the incorporation of blockchain technology to make a state administrative function more efficient or cost effective, and (2) the Department of Economic and Community Development to develop a plan to promote existing remote work workspaces and incentivize the creation of new remote work workspaces.
Title
An Act Concerning Blockchain And Emerging Technologies.
Sponsors
House Commerce Committee | Sen. Tony Hwang [R] | Rep. Kerry Szeps Wood [D] | Rep. Jaime Foster [D] |
Rep. Kara Rochelle [D] | Rep. Michael Dimassa [D] | Rep. Kenneth Gucker [D] | Rep. Catherine Abercrombie [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-06-09 - House - House Roll Call Vote 392 (Y: 142 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-04-28 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 104 (Y: 34 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-22 - Joint - CE Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable Substitute) (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-28 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 104 (Y: 34 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-22 - Joint - CE Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable Substitute) (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-07-12 | Senate | Signed by the Governor |
2021-06-28 | Senate | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor |
2021-06-28 | Senate | Transmitted to the Secretary of State |
2021-06-24 | Senate | Special Act 21-25 |
2021-06-09 | Senate | In Concurrence |
2021-06-09 | Senate | House Passed |
2021-04-29 | Senate | House Calendar Number 434 |
2021-04-29 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2021-04-28 | Senate | Senate Passed |
2021-04-07 | Senate | File Number 325 |
2021-04-07 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 203 |
2021-04-07 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2021-04-07 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2021-03-30 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/06/21 5:00 PM |
2021-03-22 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2021-03-22 | Senate | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2021-03-12 | Senate | Public Hearing 03/18 |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Commerce |